MA H47 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Stephanie Shanen, an employee of the Department of Children and Families. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Stephanie Shanen, an employee of the Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-01-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H367 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
H366 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H83 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H368 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H553 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H366 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H83 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H368 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H553 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H47 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H47.pdf |