MA H473 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a personal financial literacy curriculum in schools. Education.
Title
Establishing a personal financial literacy curriculum in schools
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Kelly Pease [R] |
Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2665 |
2023-10-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2665 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4996
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2665 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4996
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H473 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H473.pdf |