MA H4737 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3404
Note: Legislation replaced by H4756
Note: Legislation replaced by H4756
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding resource efficiency in the Commonwealth
Title
Relative to expanding resource efficiency in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-12 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 403 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Senate | Accompanied H4756 |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-07-12 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 146 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 403) |
2018-07-12 | House | Amendment 5 adopted |
2018-07-12 | House | Read third |
2018-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-11 | House | New draft of H3404 |
2018-07-11 | House | Pending new draft of H3404 |
2018-07-11 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3404 (Replaces) 2018-07-11 - New draft substituted, see H4737
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S1510 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1881 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H4756 (Replaced by) 2018-07-31 - Reported by H4857
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S1510 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1881 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H4756 (Replaced by) 2018-07-31 - Reported by H4857
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4737 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4737.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov//Journal/House/190/RollCalls/hj07122018_RollCalls.pdf |