MA H4740 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4994
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to emergency hazard health benefits for essential employees. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to emergency hazard health benefits for essential employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4994 |
2020-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-05-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4994 (Replaced by) 2020-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4740 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4740.pdf |