MA H476 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide protections to retirees whose pension benefits are transferred from a pension plan protected under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act to a substitute pension benefit provider. Financial Services.
Title
To amend the insurance law, in relation to providing protection to certain retirees from pension de-risking transactions
Sponsors
Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Rady Mom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:30 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1481 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2574 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2553 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2554 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2578 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2574 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2553 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2554 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2578 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H476 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H476.pdf |