MA H477 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4456
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve quality in early education centers and providing better access to quality early education and care. Education.
Title
To improve quality in early education centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4456 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-03-14 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Public Service |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4456 (Replaced by) 2014-09-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H477 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H477.pdf |