MA H4803 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4808
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4808
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4808
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Susanne Cleveland, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Susanne Cleveland, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4808 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-05-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4808 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4803 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4803.pdf |