MA H481 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Ayers of Quincy, a petition of Bruce J. Ayers and James M. Murphy that insurance companies be authorized to extend rebates to clients with safe driving records. Financial Services.
Title
Authorizing insurance providers to extend motor vehicle liability insurance rebates to customers with safe driving records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S509 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S962 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
H1882 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3660
S586 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2178 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H479 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3661 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S962 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
H1882 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3660
S586 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2178 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H479 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3661 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H481 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H481.pdf |