MA H4855 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4772
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 195 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 195 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a certain agricultural restriction held by the commonwealth on land in the town of Westborough
Title
Relative to a certain agricultural restriction held by the commonwealth on land in the town of Westborough
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 507 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 507 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #565 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 507 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #565 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 195 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #565 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-31 | House | Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 507) |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-30 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-30 | House | New draft of H4772 |
2018-07-30 | House | Pending new draft of H4772 |
2018-07-30 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4772 (Replaces) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H3688 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3758
H3992 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2018
H4028 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2018
H4444 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2018
H3688 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3758
H3992 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2018
H4028 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2018
H4444 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2018