MA H4856 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the recall of elected officers in the town of Sharon. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding the recall of elected officers of the town of Sharon
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Philips [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4857 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
H4754 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4170 (Similar To) 2024-06-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 115 of the Acts of 2024
H3899 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3905 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2024
H4754 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4170 (Similar To) 2024-06-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 115 of the Acts of 2024
H3899 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3905 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4856 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4856.pdf |