MA H3899 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Sharon be authorized to grant local voting rights for permanent resident aliens in said town. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing local voting rights for permanent resident aliens residing in Sharon
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Philips [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3905 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2024
H4170 (Similar To) 2024-06-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 115 of the Acts of 2024
H4754 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4857 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
H4856 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws
H4170 (Similar To) 2024-06-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 115 of the Acts of 2024
H4754 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4857 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
H4856 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3899 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3899.pdf |