MA H4861 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Saugus be authorized to appoint retired police officers of said town as special police officers. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To appoint retired police officers of the Town of Saugus as special police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2925 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3000
S460 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Substituted by a bill, see H5067
S1369 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2589
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
H932 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4602
H2162 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H5067 (Similar To) 2022-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 233 of the Acts of 2022
H3762 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2022
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
S2589 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2022
S460 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Substituted by a bill, see H5067
S1369 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2589
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
H932 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4602
H2162 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H5067 (Similar To) 2022-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 233 of the Acts of 2022
H3762 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2022
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
S2589 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4861 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4861.pdf |