MA H4905 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the school budget deficit in the city of Methuen. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the City of Methuen's petition to borrow to address the school budget deficit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-31 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-10-22 | House | Enacted |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-09-27 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-09-27 | House | Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-09-27 | House | Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-09-27 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed) |
2018-09-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-09-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-09-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3674 (Similar To) 2017-07-06 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3799
H3799 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2017
H3889 (Similar To) 2017-12-11 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3799 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2017
H3889 (Similar To) 2017-12-11 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4905 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4905.pdf |