MA H491 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to transparency and access in healthcare. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to transparency and access in healthcare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1181 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1149 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3295 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1197 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1794 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2165 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2322 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1149 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3295 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1197 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1794 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2165 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2322 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H491 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H491.pdf |