MA H4949 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4984
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Harvard be authorized to establish a cap on property taxes for means tested senior citizens. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Harvard to establish a cap on property taxes for means tested senior citizens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4984 |
2018-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-11-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-10-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1666 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1629 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1543 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
H4984 (Replaced by) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2018
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1666 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1629 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1543 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
H4984 (Replaced by) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4949 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4949.pdf |