MA H4984 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4949
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Harvard to establish a cap on property taxes for means tested seniors
Title
Authorizing the town of Harvard to establish a cap on property taxes for means tested seniors
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Bills in Third Reading report accepted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-11-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-11-29 | House | New draft of H4949 |
2018-11-29 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4949 (Replaces) 2018-11-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4984
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1666 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1629 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1666 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1629 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4984 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4984.pdf |