MA H4956 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5288
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensure for the use of graduated electronic decelerators to alter behavior of persons with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Requiring licensure for use of graduated electronic decelerators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5288 |
2022-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2022 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S713 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S219 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2571
H5288 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
H328 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S713 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S219 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2571
H5288 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
H328 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4956 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4956.pdf |