MA H4970 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5094
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - New draft substituted, see H5094
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - New draft substituted, see H5094
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to transfer the care and control of a certain parcel of land in the town of Westborough to the Department of Fish and Game. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the transfer of care and control of certain parcels of land and the conveyance of a parcel of land in the town of Westborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | New draft substituted, see H5094 |
2020-11-04 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-11-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-11-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-11-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5094 |
2020-09-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2020 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-09-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2020-08-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5094 (Replaced by) 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4970 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4970.pdf |