MA H4971 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 399 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 399 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the North Bedford Street sewer district in the town of East Bridgewater. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing the North Bedford Street sewer district in the town of East Bridgewater
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 399 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-12-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-10-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-10-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-10-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-07-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1348 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S31 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2021
H3614 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H4973 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4972 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 361 of the Acts of 2022
S31 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2021
H3614 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H4973 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4972 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 361 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4971 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4971.pdf |