MA H3614 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4966
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the traffic and safety patterns at a certain intersection in the town of East Bridgewater. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the study of traffic in East Bridgewater
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4966 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S31 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2021
H4973 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4971 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 399 of the Acts of 2022
H4972 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 361 of the Acts of 2022
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4973 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4971 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 399 of the Acts of 2022
H4972 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 361 of the Acts of 2022
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3614 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3614.pdf |