MA H4996 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4637
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on August 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to Hancock schools.
Title
Study Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-22 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2024-08-22 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2024-08-22 | House | Accompanied by H4637 |
2024-08-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4637 (Replaces) 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4996
H4572 (Similar To) 2024-05-21 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4365 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - House concurred in the Senate amendment
H4491 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4572 (Similar To) 2024-05-21 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4365 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - House concurred in the Senate amendment
H4491 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4996 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4996.pdf |