MA H5 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Inspector General (House, No. 3) as relates to Inspector General annual reports. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to Inspector General annual reports
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1293 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S780
H466 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H4346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H466 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H4346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5.pdf |