MA H5011 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to changing the name of the board of selectmen to select board in the town of Shrewsbury. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Changing the board of selectmen of the town of Shrewsbury to the select board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-09-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-09-12 | House | Enacted |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-08-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1425 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5011 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5011.pdf |