MA H5014 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Messrs. Vargas of Haverhill and Kelcourse of Amesbury, a petition of Andres X. Vargas and James M. Kelcourse (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the Haverhill Retirement Board be authorized to grant creditable service to John Farrell, an employee of the fire department of the city of Haverhill. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Haverhill Retirement Board to grant credible service to John Farrell
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-01 | House | Enacted |
2022-11-23 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-10-06 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-10-03 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-08-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1697 (Similar To) 2022-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 281 of the Acts of 2022
S1698 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4266 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1698 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4266 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5014 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5014.pdf |