MA H5020 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5059
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Cassidy of Brockton and Senator Brady, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Gerard J. Cassidy and Michael D. Brady that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to transfer certain real property located in the city of Brockton. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the sale of real property in Brockton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H5059 |
2020-10-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5059 (Replaced by) 2020-12-22 - New draft substituted, see H5212
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5020 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5020.pdf |