MA H503 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4017
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to mandate the accreditation of secondary graphic communications education in vocational and technical schools. Education.
Title
Mandating the accreditation of secondary graphic communications education in vocational and technical schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4017 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4017 (Replaced by) 2014-04-10 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H503 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H503.pdf |