MA H503 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to enhance the economic vitality of rural communities. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the rural policy advisory commission
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Daniel Carey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S265 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S3078 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - New draft (Collins) substituted, see S3088
S3095 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S3078 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - New draft (Collins) substituted, see S3088
S3095 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H503 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H503.pdf |