MA H5030 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2374
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Text of an amendment, see S2374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Text of an amendment, see S2374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Text of an amendment, see S2374 |
Same As/Similar To
S2374 (Replaced by) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2018
H240 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H240 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5030 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5030.pdf |