MA H5148 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3065
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-30 | House | Text of an amendment, see S3065 |
Same As/Similar To
S3065 (Replaced by) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2022
H5146 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3053
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
H5150 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2022
H5147 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3062
H5145 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3031
S1267 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S31 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2021
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H2063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H2189 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
H2144 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2021
H5146 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3053
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
H5150 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2022
H5147 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3062
H5145 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3031
S1267 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S31 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2021
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H2063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H2189 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
H2144 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5148 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5148.pdf |