MA H516 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S360
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-10 - Accompanied S360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-10 - Accompanied S360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to training of elder services workers in dementia and Alzheimer’s disease. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to training of elder services workers in dementia and Alzheimer’s
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-10 | Senate | Accompanied S360 |
2015-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S360 (Replaced by) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H516 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H516.pdf |