MA H518 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2091
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow teachers currently employed and receiving compensation to serve on the Board of Elementary and Secondary Education. Education.
Title
Relative to the Board of Elementary and Secondary Education
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Walz [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] |
Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2091 |
2013-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2091 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H518 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H518.pdf |