MA H5302 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H5214
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 364 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 364 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Norton to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Norton to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 364 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-12-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-10-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-10-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-10-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-09-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-09-22 | House | New draft of H5214 |
2022-09-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H5214 (Replaces) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5302
H4923 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5252
H5061 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5223
H5252 (Similar To) 2022-12-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2022
H5223 (Similar To) 2022-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2022
H4923 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5252
H5061 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5223
H5252 (Similar To) 2022-12-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2022
H5223 (Similar To) 2022-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5302 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5302.pdf |