MA H5389 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5390
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Section 253 contained in the engrossed Bill relating to economic growth and relief for the Commonwealth (see House, No. 5374), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment D of House, No. 5390). November 17, 2022.
Title
Relative to allowing members of retirement systems to buyback post-70 years if they did not previously elect to continue contributions past age 70
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-11-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-11-17 | House | For message, see H5390, Attachment D |
2022-11-17 | House | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment |
2022-11-17 | House | Enacted as section 253 of H5374 |
Same As/Similar To
H5390 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1688 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1776 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1688 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1776 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5389 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5389.pdf |