MA H546 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to teacher preparation and certification. Education.
Title
Relative to improving teacher preparation and certification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H18 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H17 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H21
H1246 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H16 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H455 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S1558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2267 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2265 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2315 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2272 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H17 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H21
H1246 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H16 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H455 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S1558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2267 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2265 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2315 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2272 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H546 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H546.pdf |