MA H548 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to school building assistance. Education.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts School Building Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2727 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1639 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4014 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2021
S2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2527 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S296 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S830 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2727 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1639 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4014 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2021
S2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2527 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S296 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S830 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2727 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H548 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H548.pdf |