MA S296 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote equity in school building assistance and ensuring best practice incentives are available for all school building projects. Education.
Title
Promoting equity in school building assistance and ensuring best practice incentives are available for all school building projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2727 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H548 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S2727 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S2727 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S296 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S296.pdf |