MA H56 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2016
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Filed by Mr. DeLeo of Winthrop. February 19, 2015.
Title
The House Rules governing the 2015-2016 Legislative Sessions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Order adopted, see H2016 |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from the temporary committee on House Rules, ought to be adopted |
Same As/Similar To
H2016 (Replaced by) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H3206 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2015
H3365 (Similar To) 2016-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2016
H3551 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Opinions returned, see H3593
H4627 (Similar To) 2016-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Resolves of 2016
H4724 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 427 of the Acts of 2016
H3206 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2015
H3365 (Similar To) 2016-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2016
H3551 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Opinions returned, see H3593
H4627 (Similar To) 2016-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Resolves of 2016
H4724 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 427 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H56 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H56.pdf |