MA H597 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-18 - Accompanied H1519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-18 - Accompanied H1519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kulik of Worthington, a petition of William N. Brownsberger and others that the Advisory Council on Radiation Protection be directed to investigate the use of computed tomography (CT) scans. Public Health.
Title
To investigate the use of computed tomography (CT) scans in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] |
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | House | Accompanied H1519 |
2011-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1519 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H597 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10295&generalCourtId=1 |