MA H636 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study mental health education requirements in public schools. Education.
Title
Establishing a commission to study mental health education requirements in public schools
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5143 |
2021-12-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1010 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5143 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1010 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5143 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H636 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H636.pdf |