MA H642 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the development and promulgation of regulations governing underground storage tanks. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the development and promulgation of regulations governing underground storage tanks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4651 |
2015-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4651 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H642 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H642.pdf |