MA H667 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4169
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the status of wild striped bass in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the conservation of striped bass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4169 |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4169 (Replaced by) 2016-05-23 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1941 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
H1835 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H358 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1975
H359 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S290
H2495 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1941 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
H1835 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H358 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1975
H359 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S290
H2495 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H667 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H667.pdf |