MA H675 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to addressing racial and cultural bias training in educator professional development. Education.
Title
Addressing racial and cultural bias training in educator professional development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4539 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S285 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
H4539 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4539 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H675 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H675.pdf |