MA H687 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4743
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to condominium elections. Housing.
Title
Relative to condominium elections
Sponsors
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. David Linsky [D] |
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4743 |
2017-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2069 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H669 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3874 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
H1563 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S381 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H4167 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4294
S2589 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 359 of the Acts of 2018
H4743 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H669 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3874 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
H1563 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S381 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H4167 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4294
S2589 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 359 of the Acts of 2018
H4743 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H687 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H687.pdf |