MA H69 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the listing of the amount of carbohydrates contained in food served in schools. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to school served food products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-04-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H69 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9897&generalCourtId=1 |