MA H696 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4754
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to low and moderate income housing. Housing.
Title
Relative to low income housing
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4754 |
2017-12-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4754 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4754 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H696 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H696.pdf |