MA H698 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-31 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-31 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the preservation of the archaeological and fossil resources of the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve relative to protecting the archaeological, geological and fossil resources of western Massachusetts
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2016-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee recommended resolve ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-14 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2015-06-22 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-06-02 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H744 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4652
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H698 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H698.pdf |