MA H703 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4055
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4055
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4055
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the law relative to the use of leghold traps for capturing furbearing animals. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to beavers
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4055 |
2013-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4055 (Replaced by) 2014-04-24 - Reported, in part, by H728
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H703 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H703.pdf |