MA H716 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow local housing authorities access to criminal records of tenants and prospective tenants. The Judiciary.
Title
Allowing local housing authorities access to criminal and other records of tenants and prospective tenants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S726 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2402
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1128 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S747 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2405
H760 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S716 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported from the committee on Senate Rules and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3701 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4754
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S726 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2402
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1128 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S747 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2405
H760 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S716 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported from the committee on Senate Rules and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3701 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4754
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H716 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H716.pdf |