MA H767 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4667
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the protection of property owned by the Commonwealth and part of the Blue Hill Reservation referred to as Fowl Meadow. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the preservation of land designated areas of critical concern
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4667 |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4667 (Replaced by) 2016-10-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2074 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2074 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H767 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H767.pdf |