MA H789 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to real estate tax exemptions to recipients of the Air Force Cross or Presidential Unit Citation. Revenue.
Title
Providing for a certain real property tax exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Rep. George Ross [R] |
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4503 |
2011-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-14 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H789 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8692&generalCourtId=1 |